Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/24/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/30/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/30/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/08/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/11/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 09/11/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/17/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/24/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 09/25/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 09/30/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/17/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/19/2008