Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/25/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/25/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 07/28/2008
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/30/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/31/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/31/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 08/01/2008