Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 01/18/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/07/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/26/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/28/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/20/2007