Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/08/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/08/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/08/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/09/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/09/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/11/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/12/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/24/2008