Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 07/31/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/11/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/16/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/16/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/18/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/25/2008