Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/15/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/15/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/15/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 09/17/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/17/2008
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/17/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/18/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/18/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/18/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/22/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/22/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/24/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/24/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/24/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/24/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/25/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/25/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/25/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/25/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/26/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/26/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/26/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/01/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/02/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 12/10/2008