Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 09/12/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 09/12/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/22/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 09/22/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/22/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/22/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/22/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/24/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/24/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/26/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/26/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/01/2008
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 10/01/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/02/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/19/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 11/19/2008