Text: S.3507 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Reference Change Senate (09/22/2008)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[S. 3507 Reference Change Senate (RCS)]







110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
                                S. 3507

     To provide for additional emergency unemployment compensation.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                           September 17, 2008

  Mr. Reed (for himself, Mr. Kennedy, Mr. Baucus, Ms. Stabenow, Mrs. 
 Boxer, Mr. Obama, Mr. Schumer, Mr. Whitehouse, Mr. Brown, Mr. Durbin, 
Mr. Levin, Mr. Rockefeller, Mr. Kerry, Mr. Biden, Mr. Lautenberg, Mrs. 
Feinstein, Mr. Harkin, Mr. Dodd, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Smith, and Mrs. Murray) 
introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the 
          Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions

           September 22 (legislative day, September 17), 2008

       Committee discharged; referred to the Committee on Finance

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
     To provide for additional emergency unemployment compensation.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Unemployment Compensation Extension 
Act of 2008''.

SEC. 2. ADDITIONAL FIRST-TIER BENEFITS.

    Section 4002(b)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (26 
U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended--
            (1) in subparagraph (A), by striking ``50'' and inserting 
        ``80''; and
            (2) in subparagraph (B), by striking ``13'' and inserting 
        ``20''.

SEC. 3. SECOND-TIER BENEFITS.

    Section 4002 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (26 
U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by adding at the end the following:
    ``(c) Special Rule.--
            ``(1) In general.--If, at the time that the amount 
        established in an individual's account under subsection (b)(1) 
        is exhausted or at any time thereafter, such individual's State 
        is in an extended benefit period (as determined under paragraph 
        (2)), such account shall be augmented by an amount equal to the 
        lesser of--
                    ``(A) 50 percent of the total amount of regular 
                compensation (including dependents' allowances) payable 
                to the individual during the individual's benefit year 
                under the State law, or
                    ``(B) 13 times the individual's average weekly 
                benefit amount (as determined under subsection (b)(2)) 
                for the benefit year.
            ``(2) Extended benefit period.--For purposes of paragraph 
        (1), a State shall be considered to be in an extended benefit 
        period, as of any given time, if--
                    ``(A) such a period is then in effect for such 
                State under the Federal-State Extended Unemployment 
                Compensation Act of 1970;
                    ``(B) such a period would then be in effect for 
                such State under such Act if section 203(d) of such 
                Act--
                            ``(i) were applied by substituting `4' for 
                        `5' each place it appears; and
                            ``(ii) did not include the requirement 
                        under paragraph (1)(A) thereof; or
                    ``(C) such a period would then be in effect for 
                such State under such Act if--
                            ``(i) section 203(f) of such Act were 
                        applied to such State (regardless of whether 
                        the State by law had provided for such 
                        application); and
                            ``(ii) such section 203(f)--
                                    ``(I) were applied by substituting 
                                `6.0' for `6.5' in paragraph (1)(A)(i) 
                                thereof; and
                                    ``(II) did not include the 
                                requirement under paragraph (1)(A)(ii) 
                                thereof.
            ``(3) Limitation.--The account of an individual may be 
        augmented not more than once under this subsection.''.

SEC. 4. PHASEOUT PROVISIONS.

    Section 4007(b) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (26 
U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended--
            (1) in paragraph (1), by striking ``paragraph (2),'' and 
        inserting ``paragraphs (2) and (3),''; and
            (2) by striking paragraph (2) and inserting the following:
            ``(2) No augmentation after march 31, 2009.--If the amount 
        established in an individual's account under subsection (b)(1) 
        is exhausted after March 31, 2009, then section 4002(c) shall 
        not apply and such account shall not be augmented under such 
        section, regardless of whether such individual's State is in an 
        extended benefit period (as determined under paragraph (2) of 
        such section).
            ``(3) Termination.--No compensation under this title shall 
        be payable for any week beginning after November 27, 2009.''.

SEC. 5. TEMPORARY FEDERAL MATCHING FOR THE FIRST WEEK OF EXTENDED 
              BENEFITS FOR STATES WITH NO WAITING WEEK.

    With respect to weeks of unemployment beginning after the date of 
enactment of this Act and ending on or before December 8, 2009, 
subparagraph (B) of section 204(a)(2) of the Federal-State Extended 
Unemployment Compensation Act of 1970 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note) shall not 
apply.

SEC. 6. EFFECTIVE DATE.

    The amendments made by sections 2, 3, and 4 shall apply as if 
included in the enactment of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008.
                                 <all>