Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/18/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/23/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/23/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/25/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/25/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/25/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/26/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/26/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/26/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/02/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 10/02/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/02/2008