Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 09/23/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/25/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/26/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 09/30/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/02/2008
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 11/19/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 11/19/2008