Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/24/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/24/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 01/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/30/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/07/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/24/2007