Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/22/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 01/24/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/25/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/29/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/08/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/20/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/20/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/11/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/25/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/25/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/25/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/20/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/30/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/28/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/19/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 01/30/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/11/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 04/15/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/15/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/16/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/16/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/16/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/21/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/22/2008