Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/23/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 01/26/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/29/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/30/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/01/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/08/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/08/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/08/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/08/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/07/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/22/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/16/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/17/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/17/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/23/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/10/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/19/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/10/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/22/2008