Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 05/23/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/19/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/20/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/28/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/26/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/16/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/24/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/13/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 12/19/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/14/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/16/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2008
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/07/2008