Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 01/24/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/25/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/31/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 02/06/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 02/26/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/10/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/12/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/15/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 11/16/2007
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/31/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/02/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/28/2008