Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/08/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/11/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/24/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/15/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/26/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/28/2007