Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR]* 01/26/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/23/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/25/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 06/11/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/23/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/03/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/03/2008