There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Research Competitiveness Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide incentives to improve America's research competitiveness, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/04/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
01/04/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
01/04/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S70-72)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/18/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 07/09/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/16/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/01/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/21/2008
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/22/2007 06/25/2007 --

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/04/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.41. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/04/2007)

Research Competitiveness Act of 2007 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) modify the tax credit for increasing research expenses to establish a standard 20% credit rate for research expenses exceeding 50% of average expenses over the preceding three year period; (2) establish a uniform 80% reimbursement rate for all contract research expenses (100% for basic research payments); (3) make such tax credit permanent; (4) allow a tax credit for equity investments in small business innovation companies; and (5) allow the issuance of tax exempt facility bonds for research park facilities used in connection with research and experimentation.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to: (1) study and report to Congress on taxpayer compliance with the substantiation requirements for claiming the tax credit for increasing research activities; and (2) issue regulations on the application of private activity bond rules to the funding of federal research agreements.