Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/29/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 01/29/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/30/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/15/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/27/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/28/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/10/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/11/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 08/02/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/07/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 12/04/2007