Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 01/08/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 01/08/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 01/08/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 01/10/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/18/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/18/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 01/23/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 01/29/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 01/30/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/06/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/10/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 07/08/2008