Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/30/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 01/30/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/30/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/31/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/31/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/31/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/31/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/31/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/31/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 02/01/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 02/01/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/06/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/06/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/06/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/06/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/08/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/08/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 02/12/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/12/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 02/12/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/13/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/15/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/05/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/05/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/05/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/05/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/05/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/07/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/08/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/08/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/09/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/10/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/10/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/12/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/12/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/12/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/19/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/25/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/25/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/25/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/02/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/03/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/03/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/07/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/08/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/11/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/15/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 05/24/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/24/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/13/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 06/18/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 02/12/2008