Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 01/30/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/31/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/05/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/08/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 02/13/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/20/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/03/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 06/05/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/21/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/30/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 08/03/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/06/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 12/13/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/13/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 12/13/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 12/13/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/26/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/02/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/10/2008