Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/06/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/08/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/04/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/04/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/04/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/25/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/06/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/06/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/05/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/19/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 12/11/2008