Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/31/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/08/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/08/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/14/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/14/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/14/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/14/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/19/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/20/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 07/10/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/11/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/12/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 07/12/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/13/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/17/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 07/17/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/23/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/30/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 08/02/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 08/02/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/03/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 08/03/2007