There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a congressional gold medal to Michael Ellis DeBakey, M.D.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/16/2007Became Public Law No: 110-95. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2007Signed by President.
10/04/2007Presented to President.
10/02/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11078)
03/27/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3983)
03/27/2007Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3982-3983)
02/01/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/16/2007Became Public Law No: 110-95. (TXT | PDF)
10/16/2007Signed by President.
10/04/2007SenatePresented to President.
10/02/2007-10:55amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/02/2007-10:55amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11078)
10/02/2007-10:26amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 474.
10/02/2007-10:26amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11078-11081)
10/02/2007-10:26amHouseMr. Green, Al moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/27/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/27/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/27/2007-8:37pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/27/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3983)
03/27/2007SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3982-3983)
02/01/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1527-1528)
02/01/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1526-1527)

Cosponsors (71)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/12/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/13/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/20/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/20/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/22/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/22/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/22/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/22/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/22/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/22/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/22/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/22/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 03/22/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 03/22/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/22/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/22/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 03/22/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 03/22/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/22/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/22/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/22/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/22/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 03/22/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/22/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/22/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/22/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/22/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/22/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/22/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/22/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/22/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 03/22/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 03/22/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 03/22/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/22/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/22/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/22/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/22/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 03/22/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/22/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/22/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/22/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/22/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/22/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/22/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/22/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 03/22/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 03/22/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/23/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/26/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/27/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/01/2007 Referred to
03/27/2007 Discharged from
House Financial Services03/27/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.474. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-95 (10/16/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Directs the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to arrange for the presentation of a congressional gold medal to Michael Ellis DeBakey, M.D. (who performed the first successful coronary bypass, pioneered the field of telemedicine, was elected the first President of Baylor College of Medicine, and received the Presidential Medal of Freedom with Distinction and the National Medal of Science) in recognition of his many outstanding contributions to the nation.