There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Joshua Omvig Veterans Suicide Prevention Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Joshua Omvig Veterans Suicide Prevention Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reduce the incidence of suicide among veterans.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
07/23/2007Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka without amendment. With written report No. 110-132.
02/01/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date
09/05/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11097-11101)
Action By: Senate
07/23/2007Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 279.
Action By: Senate
07/23/2007Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Akaka without amendment. With written report No. 110-132.
06/27/2007Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/25/2007Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 110-89.
02/01/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: Senate
02/01/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1529-1530)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs02/01/2007 Referred to
04/25/2007 Hearings by
06/27/2007 Markup by
07/23/2007 Reported by S. Rept. 110-132

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.479. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate without amendment (07/23/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary has been expanded because action occurred on the measure.)

Joshua Omvig Veterans Suicide Prevention Act - Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) suicide among veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD) is a serious problem; and (2) the Secretary of Veterans Affairs should take into consideration the special needs of veterans suffering from PTSD in developing and implementing the program required under this Act.

Directs the Secretary to develop and implement a comprehensive program for reducing the incidence of suicide among veterans.

Requires the program to include: (1) a national mental health campaign to increase mental health awareness in the veteran community; (2) mandatory training on suicide and suicide prevention for appropriate Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) employees and contractor personnel; (3) family education and peer support counseling; (4) veterans' health assessments, counseling, and treatment programs; (5) suicide prevention counselors; (6) research on suicide prevention; (7) treatment programs for veterans suffering from substance abuse; (8) 24-hour veterans' mental health care availability; and (9) a toll-free hotline.

Requires a report from the Secretary to Congress on VA programs and activities to reduce the incidence of suicide among veterans.