Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/01/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/08/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/05/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/12/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/17/2007