Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/06/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/12/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/01/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/19/2007