Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/08/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/06/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/08/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 03/15/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/12/2007