Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/14/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 04/16/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/02/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/15/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 06/14/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/26/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/12/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/19/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/15/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/15/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/18/2008