Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/16/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 02/06/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/23/2008