Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 01/08/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 02/07/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/07/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/14/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/26/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/10/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/02/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/03/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/05/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/12/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/15/2007