Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/26/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/01/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/07/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/23/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 07/31/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/03/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 02/26/2008