Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 02/16/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/07/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 06/18/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/13/2008