There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

A bill to amend title 39, United States Code, to extend the authority of the United States Postal Service to issue a semipostal to raise funds for breast cancer research.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An act to amend title 39, United States Code, to extend the authority of the United States Postal Service to issue a semipostal to raise funds for breast cancer research.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to extend the special postage stamp for breast cancer research for 2 years.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/21/2007Became Public Law No: 110-150. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2007Signed by President.
12/19/2007Presented to President.
12/13/2007Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in House amendments (text and title) by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S15568; text as Senate agreed to House amendments: CR S15568)
12/11/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H15248)
11/14/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S14416)
11/07/2007Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. With written report No. 110-222.
02/14/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
12/21/2007Became Public Law No: 110-150. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2007Signed by President.
12/19/2007SenatePresented to President.
12/14/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/13/2007SenateSenate concurred in House amendments (text and title) by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S15568; text as Senate agreed to House amendments: CR S15568)
12/12/2007SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
12/11/2007-2:25pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2007-2:25pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2007-2:25pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H15248)
12/11/2007-2:20pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 597.
12/11/2007-2:20pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H15248-15249)
12/11/2007-2:19pmHouseMr. Davis (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/15/2007-12:07pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/15/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/15/2007-9:52amHouseReceived in the House.
11/14/2007SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S14416)
11/14/2007SenateS.Amdt.3678 Amendment SA 3678 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2007SenateS.Amdt.3678 Amendment SA 3678 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S14416; text: CR S14416) To amend the title.
11/14/2007SenateS.Amdt.3676 Amendment SA 3676 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/14/2007SenateS.Amdt.3676 Amendment SA 3676 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Feinstein. (consideration: CR S14416; text: CR S14416) To extend the special postage stamp for breast cancer research for 4 years.
11/14/2007SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S14416)
11/07/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 473.
11/07/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. With written report No. 110-222.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/30/2007SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
02/14/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1976)
02/14/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1975-1976)

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 02/15/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/15/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/15/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/15/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/15/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/16/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/16/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/28/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/28/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/28/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/28/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/28/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/10/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/10/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/10/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/02/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/02/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/03/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/03/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/03/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/24/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/06/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/16/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/25/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/06/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/24/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/01/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/02/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/08/2007

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs02/14/2007 Referred to
08/01/2007 Markup by
11/07/2007 Reported by S. Rept. 110-222
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security03/30/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.597. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-150 (12/21/2007)

Extends through December 31, 2011, provisions requiring the U.S. Postal Service to issue a special postage stamp for first-class mail that costs not less than 15% more than the regular first-class stamp to contribute funding for breast cancer research.

Requires the National Institutes of Health (NIH) and the Department of Defense (DOD) to annually report to Congress and the Government Accountability Office (GAO) on the use of any such funding, including a description of any significant advances or accomplishments.