Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 02/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 02/15/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/15/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/15/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 02/15/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 02/15/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 02/16/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 02/16/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 02/28/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 02/28/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/28/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 02/28/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/28/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 04/10/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/10/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/10/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/24/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/02/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/02/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/03/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/03/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/03/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/24/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/06/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/16/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/25/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/06/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 09/24/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 11/01/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 11/02/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 11/08/2007