Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/15/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 02/15/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 02/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/13/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/13/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/15/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 03/19/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/20/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/11/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/13/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 10/25/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 01/22/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/06/2008