Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 03/29/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/19/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 04/19/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/25/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/26/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/03/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/03/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/07/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/22/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 06/12/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/12/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/25/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/29/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/10/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/17/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/23/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/28/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/28/2008