Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/09/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/19/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/27/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/19/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 05/03/2007