Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/05/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/05/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/19/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/18/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/16/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 06/26/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/01/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 11/14/2007