Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/01/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/01/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/19/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/12/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/14/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/10/2007