Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/16/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/06/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/06/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/07/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/23/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 04/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/23/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/13/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/13/2008