Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/28/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/20/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/07/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/19/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/01/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/01/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/15/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/23/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/28/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/22/2008
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/2008