There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Edward William Brooke III Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Edward William Brooke III Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Edward William Brooke III Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a congressional gold medal to Edward William Brooke III in recognition of his unprecedented and enduring service to our Nation.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
07/01/2008Became Public Law No: 110-260. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2008Signed by President.
06/24/2008Presented to President.
06/10/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H5162-5163)
03/29/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S4226)
03/29/2007Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4225-4226)
02/17/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/01/2008Became Public Law No: 110-260. (TXT | PDF)
07/01/2008Signed by President.
06/24/2008SenatePresented to President.
06/10/2008-4:28pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/10/2008-4:28pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5162-5163)
06/10/2008-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 682.
06/10/2008-4:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5162-5166)
06/10/2008-4:05pmHouseMr. Frank (MA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/30/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/30/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/30/2007-10:05amHouseReceived in the House.
03/29/2007SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S4226)
03/29/2007SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4225-4226)
02/17/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (68)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/26/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/26/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/05/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/14/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/26/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/26/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/26/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/26/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/26/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/26/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/26/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/26/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/10/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs02/17/2007 Referred to
03/29/2007 Discharged from
House Financial Services03/30/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.682. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-260 (07/01/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the Senate passed version is repeated here.)

Edward William Brooke III Congressional Gold Medal Act - Requires the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Senate to make appropriate arrangements for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of a gold medal of appropriate design, to Edward William Brooke III, the first African American elected by popular vote to the U.S. Senate, in recognition of his unprecedented and enduring service to our Nation.