Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 02/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/26/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 02/26/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/26/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/26/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 02/26/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 02/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 03/05/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 03/14/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/14/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/26/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/26/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/26/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/26/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 03/26/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/26/2007
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/26/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/26/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 03/26/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/10/2008