Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/27/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/28/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/28/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/28/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/28/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 03/05/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/06/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/06/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/15/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/15/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 03/22/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/27/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/27/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/16/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/15/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/15/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/15/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 05/16/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/23/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/23/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/01/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/10/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/03/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/31/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 12/05/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/08/2008