Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/27/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/10/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 10/04/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/15/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/16/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 10/31/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/06/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 11/08/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 11/08/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 12/04/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 12/19/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/30/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/11/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/26/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/29/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/01/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/02/2008