Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/09/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/30/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/01/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/28/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/19/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/05/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 09/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2007