Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/14/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/20/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/11/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 04/18/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/24/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/24/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/24/2007