Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/28/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/28/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/17/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/10/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/26/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/30/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 08/02/2007